Selsor v. Weaver et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Selsor
Defendant: B. Weaver, Castaneda, Docante, T.J. Jordan, D. D. Nora and V. Juarez
Case Number: 1:2015cv00918
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of Dismissal; ORDER to Clerk of Court to Close Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER That Inmate Jeffrey Selsor is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Jeffrey Selsor, CDCR# K-82840, for Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/16/2017. (Flores, E)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Attend Settlement Conference by Video, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/6/17: Settlement Conference set for September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison, Corcoran. (Hellings, J)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 26 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DISMISSING All Claims Against Defendant Castaneda; ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Castaneda From This Action; and ORDER TERMINATING 24 Defendant Castaneda's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/2/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Defendant Castaneda and all Claims against him, with Prejudice, for Failure to Prosecute and Failure to Obey a Court Order; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/22/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/13/17. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO RECAPTION CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 14 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/15/16. B. Weaver, D. D. Nora, and V. Juarez Dismissed. (Verduzco, M)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/16: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selsor v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Selsor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. D. Nora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?