Gonzales v. Podsakoff, et al.

Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Defendant: A. Podsakoff, L. Lawrence, B. Stringer, Lassey, J. Medina, J. Juarez, E. Garza, R. Mendoza, D. Hernandez and Gonzales
Case Number: 1:2015cv00924
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference would be Beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2018. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
August 6, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Blood Testing signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/6/18. (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2018 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/30/18. (Original document sent to Plaintiff along with this order.) (Marrujo, C)
June 12, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
April 18, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 79 Motion to Copy and Transfer Exhibits from this case to 1:16-cv-01813, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/17/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 65 & 66 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/19/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 14, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Defendants' Motion for an Order Requiring Security, Screening of the First Amended Complaint, and on Plaintiff's Motion to be Removed From the State's Vexatious Litigant List, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/14/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 14, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 49 Defendants' Motion for an Order Requiring Plaintiff to Pay a Security be DENIED Without Prejudice, and Plaintiff's Request to be Removed From California's Vexatious Litigant List be DENIED for Lack of Jurisdiction re 26 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/13/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2018 65 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default be DENIED re 26 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/6/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendants' 51 Request for Clarification and Staying Action Other than Discovery on Exhaustion Issues signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/26/2017. 10-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 22, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Copies and to Limit Discovery to Five Years, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 09/22/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 13, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/13/2017. 21-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
September 7, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 35 Defendants' Request for Consolidation signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 25, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 26 Motion for Consolidation signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/25/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd.(Flores, E)
May 22, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/19/2017. (Flores, E)
April 21, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's 29 & 33 Motions for Reconsideration of Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/20/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 1, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause Regarding Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motions for Copies of Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/31/16. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
April 25, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why In Forma Pauperis Stats Should Not Be Revoked re 1 , 3 , 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/25/16. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 29, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion For Order Granting Plaintiff Right To Obtain Copies From Law Library On Demand (Doc. 6 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/28/2015. (Fahrney, E)
October 28, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motions For Courtesy Copy Of Docket (Docs. 11 and 12 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/28/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 30, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Finding Plaintiff Eligible To Proceed In Forma Pauperis In This Action (Doc. 1 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/30/2015. (Fahrney, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Podsakoff, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Podsakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lassey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?