Villery v. California Department of Corrections, et al.
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, Jeffrey Beard, J. Lewis, R. L. Briggs, K Z Allen, Oleg Liflyandsky, C Cornell, Psy,D, Richard Kendall, Barbara Zager, Acosta, Kimberly Holland, R A Groves, C Schuyler, Jay Jones, Majid Naficy, Alicia Guerrero, A Aithal, Jennifer Seymour, A Carrizales, J Woodward, M. Pallares, Fisher, S Hernandez and A Grimmig
Case Number: 1:2015cv00987
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the preliminary injunction 128 , be DENIED ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/25/2020. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER ADOPTING 116 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust re 51 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/25/19. Fisher, S Hernandez, A. Miranda (Correctional Counselor I at CSATF), Majid Naficy, M. Pallares, Jennifer Seymour, A Aithal and A Carrizales terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/16/19. (Due: 06/19/2019) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN PART and GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction IN PART 62 , 11 , 113 , 114 , 115 , 117 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/22/2019: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Regarding Parties' Motions to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order 68 , 85 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/16/2019: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction 62 , 78 , 99 ; ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion to Strike Evidence in Support of Plaintiff's Reply 100 , 104 , 105 ; ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions Related to Request for a Preliminary Injunction 86 , 91 , 102 , 110 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/30/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference Set for October 18, 2018; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Conference 106 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/24/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/1/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING 58 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Plaintiff's 57 Emergency Motion Under the All Writs Act, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/23/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting Request to File Medical Records under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/06/2018. (Flores, E)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendant Kernan and Beard's 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/16/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Reconsideration of July 25, 2017 Screening Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/14/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Following Second Informal Telephonic Discovery Conference, Held on January 30 2018,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/18. (Case Management Deadline: 2/9/2018, Filing Deadline: 3/16/2018, Responses due by 2/23/2018) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 57 Emergency Motion for Writ Under the all Writs Act signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/24/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 2/12/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Regarding Parties' 54 Stipulation Request to Allow Defendants to File an Amended Answer under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/18. (10-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER following informal telephonic discovery conference held on January 12, 2018 re 48 , 49 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 46 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING INFORMAL DISCOVERY TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/15/17. (Joint Statement Deadline: 1/5/2018, Informal Discovery Telephonic Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 42 43 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, as Amended; Exhaustion Motion Filing Deadline: February 2, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 25 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/20/17: This action is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Hellings, J)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Screen the Complaint 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/29/16: Motion is DENIED as moot. (Hellings, J)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 15 Motion for TRO signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villery v. California Department of Corrections, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Z Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleg Liflyandsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psy,D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Zager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Schuyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majid Naficy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Aithal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Carrizales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Pallares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Grimmig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?