Lindblom v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: April Lindblom
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation and Western Union Business Solutions (USA) LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00990
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DECLINING TO RELATE CASES [ECF No. 143], signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/17/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING 164 Motion Leave to Intervene as a Right; ORDER DENYING 156 Motion for Leave to Substitute Class Representative; ORDER DENYING 177 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/23/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Denying Intervenors Motions for Leave to Intervene (Docs. 124 , 127 , 136 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/29/2018. (Valdez, E)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of TCPA CLAIMS; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (Doc. 108), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/2018. (Herman, H)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 111), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2018. (Herman, H)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING Request to File Under Seal (Doc. 118 Notice of Request). signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/1/2017. (Herman, H)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule (Doc. 114 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/2017. The Court, having considered the parties' stipulation to continue the briefing schedule, finds that good cause exists t o change the due date of the parties' respective responses to plaintiff's pending motion for class certification and defendant's motion for summary judgment to November 28, 2017. Replies to both motions remain due December 15, 2017, and the hearing remains scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on January 12, 2018. (Valdez, E)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JOINT STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Law and Motion Deadlines and Vacate Class Certification Hearing Pending Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/27/2017. Having reviewed the above stipulation, and for good cause shown, the parties' joint request to continue class certification deadlines is GRANTED. (Doc. 92 ). Accordingly, the Motion for Class Certification hearing set for July 14, 2017 is VACATED. All other class certification deadlines in the above-styled case shall be stayed pending resolution of mediation. Within three days of finalizing the date, the parties are ORDERED to notify Courtroom Deputy Harriet Herman of the intended date of mediation. Further, the parties SHALL file a status report within three business days of mediation indicating whether a settlement has been reached, and if necessary, proposed class certification deadlines. (Valdez, E)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline: that, for good cause showing, the fact discovery period in the above-styled case shall be extended through January 20, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/8/2016. (Herman, H)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Plaintiff's STIPULATION for Leave to Amend; ORDER: (1.) Plaintiff APRIL LINDBLOM's request for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED; (2.) On or before September 6, 2016, Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation, as a separate entry in the docket for purposes of clarifying the record; (3.) On or before September 20, 2016, Defendant shall file its initial response to the Second Amended Complaint. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/30/2016. (Herman, H)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re Defendant's 53 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/9/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED Protective ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/6/2016. (Herman, H)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re Amended Joint Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings for 60 Days, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/19/16. Case Stayed. (Gonzalez, R)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Memorandum Decision and ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; Western Union is DISMISSED from this suit with prejudice, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER CONTINUING deadline for reply and vacating hearing date, documents 31 and 35 . Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS: Western Union shall have through and including 11/23/2015, to file its reply brief in further support of its motion to di smiss and the hearing on the motion to dismiss, currently noticed for 11/23/2015, is VACATED. Upon expiration of the revised reply deadline, the matter will be submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/16/2015. (Rooney, M)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Request to Terminate the OCWEN Defendants and their Counsel from Court Docket 8 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/17/15. Ocwen Financial Corporation and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindblom v. Santander Consumer USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Lindblom
Represented By: Wesley W. Barnett, NCAED
Represented By: D. Frank Davis, NCAED
Represented By: John E. Norris, NCAED
Represented By: Courtney L. Peinhardt, NCAED
Represented By: Dargan Maner Ware, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc.
Represented By: S. Greg Burge, NCAED
Represented By: Zachary D. Miller, NCAED
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Campbell
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain, NCAED
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Campbell
Represented By: Richard Aaron Chastain, NCAED
Represented By: Michael R. Pennington, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Union Business Solutions (USA) LLC
Represented By: Susan H. Boyles, NCAED
Represented By: Joseph S. Dowdy, NCAED
Represented By: D. Greg Durbin
Represented By: John W. Scott, NCAED
Represented By: Daniel R. Taylor, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?