Caputo v. Kern County Sheriff's Office

Plaintiff: Brian Caputo
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 1:2015cv01008
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DISMISSING Doe Defendants and Reassigning Action to Magistrate Judge; New Case Number is 1:15-cv-1008 EPG (PC), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 183 Motion for Sanctions without Prejudice and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/19/2019. (Flores, E)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Striking Portions of Defendant Black's Motion for Summary Judgment and Warning to Plaintiff Re Opposing Remaining Aspects of Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/18/2019. (Flores, E)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Response to Motion by Defendant Michelle Black for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/11/2019. (Flores, E)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re 173 Motion by Defendant Michelle Black for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/29/2019. 2-week deadline. (Jessen, A)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Brian Caputo #71322-097 Telephonic Appearance on 06/05/2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/30/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/15/2019: Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Thurston on June 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. at the U.S. District Court, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, CA 93301. (Hellings, J)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Requiring Parties to Meet and Confer Re: Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/20/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to Depose Plaintiff, DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions, and REQUIRING Defendants to Re-Serve Documents 156 , 157 & 159 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/31/2019: Defendants have seven days from the date of service of this order to re-serve the documents that were returned as undeliverable. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER on Plaintiff's Request for Relief and Request to the Courts 151 , 152 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2019: Plaintiff's request for relief is denied and that Plaintiff's request to the courts is denied. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Following Status Conference 142 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/20/2018: The expert disclosure deadline is March 15, 2019; The rebuttal expert disclosure deadline is April 19, 2019; The expert discovery cutoff is May 17, 2019; and All other dates and deadlines remain the same. (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ****DISREGARD****ORDER RESETTING Initial Scheduling Conference given Plaintiff's failure to appear at Court scheduled conference; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to comply with Court's Order requiring scheduling conference statement and initial d isclosures; ORDER REQUIRING Defendants to supplement initial disclosures; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of ECF NO. 22 and a Copy of this Order to Sender Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson, the Warden of Pelican Bay State Pris on and the Litigation Coordinator for Pelican Bay State Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/18. (Case Management Deadline: 1/4/2019, Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to Reschedule Conference 133 ; ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve a Copy of This Order on Warden Martin and Counselor Flowers signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/6/2018: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hellings, J)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Designation of Counsel for Service 134 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/20/2018: Plaintiff's request for the Court to prevent Defendants from having a second counsel assigned to their case is DENIED. (Hellings, J)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for More Legible Copies and Motion for Sanctions re 120 , 121 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/14/18. (Gonzalez, R)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE Plaintiff's 125 Notice of Change of Address; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the 44 81 93 Screening Orders and the 104 Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER on Plaintiff's Reply; ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions and Request to Exclude Evidence are DENIED, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/10/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Directing Defendants to Provide Plaintiff With Paper Copies of Documents or to Confirm That Plaintiff Can Review DVDS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/23/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions and Directing Defendants to Serve Plaintiff With a Copy of Their Initial Disclosures 112 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoena's Duces Tecum, Request to Subpoena Witnesses, and Request to Seal 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel Without Prejudice 105 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference 94 , 96 , 97 , 98 & 99 ; ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve Plaintiff With Copy of Order Requiring Initial Disclosures 82 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/28/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ADOPTING 81 Findings and Recommendations, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Add Deputy Delgado as Doe Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/13/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery 88 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Recusal of Chief Judge O'Neill, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/5/18. (Gonzalez, R)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that all claims and defendants be DISMISSED, except for Plaintiffs claims for violation of his Fourteenth Amendment due process rights against defendant Black and Doe Defendant(s), for retaliation in violati on of the First Amendment against defendant Gonzalez, and for excessive force in violation of the Fourteenth Amendment against defendant Gonzalez; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/22/18. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 67 Motion for Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Requiring Response From Kern County Sheriff's Office to 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Requiring Status Report re 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DIRECTING Service of Subpoena by the United States Marshals Service Without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/20/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Deputy Ramos as Defendant Doe 1 WITHOUT PREJUDICE 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/5/17. (Hellings, J)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Copy of Order and DENYING Motion to Compel and for Sanctions 36 , 37 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the Order Entered on February 8, 2017 32 and Attachments, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/31/17. (Hellings, J)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Motion for Subpoenas and Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel 29 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/10/17. (Hellings, J)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2017. (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 8 Motion for Relief of Medical Neglect, Medical Negligence and Medical Abuse, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/17. (Marrujo, C)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Response from the Kern County Sherriff's Office Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Relief of Medical Neglect, Medical Negligence, and Meidcal Abuse, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/6/16. 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Provide Additional Information Regarding His Motion for Relief of Medical Neglect, Medical Negligence and Medical Abuse 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/22/16: 7-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caputo v. Kern County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Caputo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?