Hale et al v. Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Hale and O'Brian Rangel
Defendant: Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc., Ensign Energy Services Inc and Ensign United States Drilling Inc
Case Number: 1:2015cv01042
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DISMISSING CASE ; ORDERED to enter Judgment In Favor of Defendants pursuant to the September 28, 2017 order and to close this case, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/20/17. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting Defendants' 35 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/27/2017. (1. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; 2. Summary judgment is entered in defendants' favor with respect to plaintiff's federal WARN Act and California WARN Act claims; and3. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings consistent with this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Denying 70 Request to Seal Documents, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/2/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Closing the Matter as to Plaintiff Hale 69 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2017. (Hall, S)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING Second Amendment to the Schedule on the Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2017. Opposition or statement of non-opposition due by 5/22/2017; Reply due by 6/22/2017. Motion Hearing CONTINUED to 7/5/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING Amendment to the Schedule on the Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/27/2016. Motion for summary judgment: Opposition or statement of non-opposition due by 5/1/2017; Reply due by 6/1/2017; Motion Hearing CONTINUED to 6/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AFTER FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/2016. Further Status Conference set for 12/5/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AFTER STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2016. Joint status report due by 10/5/2016. Further Status Conference set for 10/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER 41 Continuing Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2016. Status Conference CONTINUED to 8/15/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Joint report due one week before status conference. (Hall, S)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/29/2016. (Hall, S)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/21/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline: 2/3/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/13/2016; Opposition due by 9/30/2016; Reply due by 10/28/2016. Status Conference set for 7/7/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Status Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Ensign Energy Services, Inc. only signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/19/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference and Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/16/2016. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 4/20/2016 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale et al v. Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hale
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Brian Rangel
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign United States Drilling (California) Inc.
Represented By: Connie M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Olivia Vanessa Franco Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ensign United States Drilling Inc
Represented By: Connie M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?