Becky Greer et al v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Plaintiff: Becky Greer, Timothy C. Budnik, Rosario Saenz and Ian Carty
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Case Number: 1:2015cv01066
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Referring Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2018 268 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Approving stipulation clarifying the joint stipulation of class settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2018. (Rosales, O)
May 24, 2018 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IBEWS MOTION TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1292(B) AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. IBEW's Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal under 27 U.S.C. § 1292(b) (ECF No. 253) is DENIED. The Cou rt's temporary stay, issued May 14, 2018 (ECF No. 255) is LIFTED. Any deadlines set forth in the Court's order of May 3, 2018 (ECF No. 251) shall run from today's date. ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/24/2018. (Thorp, J)
May 3, 2018 251 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING Plaintiffs 238 Motion for order (1) conditionally certifying the settlement class; (2) preliminarily approving the class action settlement; (3) appointing Plaintiffs as class representatives and their counsel as class counsel ; (4) approving in part and requiring changes in part to notice packet; and (5) setting a hearing for final approval of the class action settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/3/2018.(Revised First Notice Deadline: 5/17/2018; Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Motion for Class Counsels attorneys fees and costs Hearing set for 10/26/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
January 29, 2018 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER following settlement agreement as follows: The Court has received notification that the parties have reached a proposed class action settlement in this case. While the class action settlement is subject to preliminary and final Court approval, the Court finds it appropriate at this time to vacate all deadlines and deny all pending motions (ECF Nos. 161 , 190 , 211 ) as moot. Additionally, the Court specifically vacates the February 2, 2018 date for submission of a joint status report (ECF No. 227 ). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/26/2018. (Rooney, M)
October 17, 2017 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/17/2017. (Valdez, E)
September 12, 2017 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant IBEW Local 1245's Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment, document 159 , and granting in part and denying in part defendant PG&E's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in th e Alternative, Summary Adjudication, document 161 . Within 14 days from this order, each party shall submit a supplemental memorandum, no longer than 10 pages per party, regarding which if any remaining part of the summary judgment motions they inte nd to pursue consistent with this order with an explanation regarding why summary judgment on the other causes of action is appropriate notwithstanding the rulings in this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/11/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 26, 2017 185 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation as follows: 1) Plaintiffs shall have until August 4, 2017, to file their motion for class certification; 2) Defendants shall have until September 8, 2017, to file each of their oppositions to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification; 3) Plaintiffs shall have until September 29, 2017, to file their reply to Defendants' oppositions; and 4) The originally scheduled class certification hearing date of October 6, 2017, remains unmodified. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/26/2017. (Rooney, M) (Main Document 185 replaced on 7/26/2017) (Rooney, M).
June 12, 2017 168 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER as follows: Based on the stipulation between Defendants Pacific Gas and Electric Company and IBEW Local 1245, Defendants may file an amended compendium of evidence in connection with their motions for summary judgment. Defendant s shall, to the extent possible, maintain the pagination of the amended compendium such that the page citations in their motions for summary judgment remain accurate. The amended compendium will not replace the original compendium (ECF No. 156 ) on the docket, but will be used in consideration of Defendants' motions for summary judgment and any motions thereafter. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/12/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 1, 2017 166 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 148 Motion to Strike Deposition Errata Sheets, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 18, 2017 165 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER, with good cause appearing therein, the Court hereby enters the stipulation by the Parties as an order of the Court. Plaintiffs shall have until June 16, 2017, to file an opposition to PG&E's Motion for Summary Judgment (EC F No. 161 ) and to Local 1245's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 159 ). Defendants may each have until July 14, 2017, to file any reply to Plaintiffs' opposition. The hearing regarding Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment is continued to 7/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. All class certification deadlines are continued for six (6) weeks from the dates in the Amended Stipulated Scheduling Order (ECF No. 128 ). Plaintiff s' motion for class certification is due on or before July 28, 2017. Each Defendants' opposition is due on or before September 1, 2017. Plaintiffs' reply is due on or before September 22, 2017. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is continued to 10/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. All other dates remain as previously set. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/17/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 27, 2017 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, document 144 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 6, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Stipulated scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/6/2017. (Pre-Certification Initial Expert Witness Disclosures due by 3/24/2017; Pre-Certification Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/28/2017; Pre-Certi fication Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2017; Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed by 6/16/2017; Defendants Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 7/21/2017; Plaintiffs Reply In Support of Motion for Class Certification due by 8 /11/2017; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Deadline for Hearings on Non- Dispositive Motions: 1/12/2018; Deadline for Hearings on Dispositive Motions : 1/26/2018) (Rosales, O)
January 25, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court Order after hearing re: discovery status conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/25/2017. (Rosales, O)
December 21, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to DISMISS with Prejudice, Plaintiff: Monica Muldrow, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/20/2016. Monica Muldrow terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 13, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after hearing re Motions to Compel, document 106 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/13/2016. (Rooney, M)
November 2, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Damages signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/31/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 6, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after hearing re Service Representative I Discovery Dispute signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/6/2016. (Rooney, M)
September 1, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline to Complete Pre-Certification Non-Expert Written Discovery Excluding Depositions November 21, 2016; Deadline to Complete Pre-Certification Non-Expert Depositions January 27, 2017; Deadline for Initial Expert Witness Disclosures February 24, 2017; Deadline for Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures March 31, 2017; Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery April 28, 2017; Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification June 16, 2017; Defendants' Opposition t o Motion for Class Certification July 21, 2017; Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification August 11, 2017; Hearing On Motion for Class Certification August 25, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Deadline for Hearings on Non-Dispositive Motions January 12, 2018; Deadline for Hearings on Dispositive Motions January 26, 2018; Pre-Trial Conference March 15, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. G rosjean; Trial May 15, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. As discussed at the discovery hearing on August 30, 2016, the Court also sets a Status Conference for November 21, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1 0 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. A joint status report shall be filed with the Court and emailed to chambers at epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov no later than November 14, 2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/31/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 19, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION for Protective Order and AMENDED Order Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/18/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 18, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation for Protective Order and Order thereon [Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)], signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2016. (Rosales, O)
May 18, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company's 47 Motion to Join IBEW Local 1245 as Party Defendant, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/17/16. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to ADVANCE the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/25/2016 to 2/23/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/16/2016. (Rooney, M)
December 28, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Defendant Pacific Gas and Electric Company's 13 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/28/2015. (Martinez, A)
August 28, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for Filing of First Amended Complaint for Damages, Injunctive, and Declaratory Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/27/15. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becky Greer et al v. Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Greer
Represented By: Dylan J. Crosby
Represented By: Michael S. Helsley
Represented By: Patrick D. Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Budnik
Represented By: Dylan J. Crosby
Represented By: Michael S. Helsley
Represented By: Patrick D. Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Saenz
Represented By: Dylan J. Crosby
Represented By: Michael S. Helsley
Represented By: Patrick D. Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Carty
Represented By: Dylan J. Crosby
Represented By: Michael S. Helsley
Represented By: Patrick D. Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?