United States of America v. Garcia

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jose V. Garcia
Case Number: 1:2015cv01077
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 42:0427
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Terminating Wage Garnishment 35 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/2/2018. (Hellings, J)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED FINAL ORDER for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED FINAL ORDER for Writ of Continuing Garnishment (Wages), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/28/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL ORDER FOR WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT (WAGES) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing (1/22/2016). FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Docs. 11, 12). Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/14/2016. (Herman, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patrick John Suter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose V. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?