Gonzalez v. Razo et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Antonio Gonzalez
Defendant: J. Razo, Johnson, Blankenship, Ybarra, Brennan, Anderson, B. Wedertz, R. Schmidt, Lundey and K. Allen
Case Number: 1:2015cv01098
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 163 Motion for Court to Forward Full Copy of Cases to the United States Attorney signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/15/2020. (Flores, E)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ADOPTING 161 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Denying 149 Motion, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 149 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement, Full Payment to Attorney and/or Allow Plaintiff Withdraw Settlement and Proceed With Trial be Denied; ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request to File Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/28/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER on Defendants' 159 Request for Clarification RE: Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement; Request for Extension of Time to Pay Settlement Funds signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/18/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Defendants' Response 154 ; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Reply, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/5/19. (Marrujo, C)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case 144 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/30/3019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate Manuel Antonio Gonzalez, T-42888, is no Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/24/2019. (Flores, E)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Manuel Antonio Gonzalez, CDC #T-42888, Plaintiff Witness on January 24, 2019 at 1:00 PM, at 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/2/2019. (Hellings, J)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Second Motion to Assist Attorney Stanley Goff, Jr., In Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction and Denying Request for Order Directed at Attorney Goff re 133 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/1/18. (Gonzalez, R)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 UPDATED SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/18. ( Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 01:00 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 5/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Marrujo, C)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Manuel Antonio Gonzalez, CDC# T-42888 on April 11, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. at United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield, CA, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/12/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 02/1/18. (Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ADOPTING 94 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING 58 Motion for Summary Judgment ; Case referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send a copy of this order to Manuel Gonzalez, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/17. (This order sent to Manuel Gonzalez T-42888 RJ Donovan) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied Because Plaintiff Exhausted His Available Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/22/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within 21 Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Adopting 63 Findings and Recommendations, Dismissing Defendant R.N. Rice from this Action without Prejudice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/4/17. R.N. Rice terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Allowing Additional Briefing and Evidence and Setting Deadlines,signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/31/17. (Case Management Deadline: 8/17/2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING HEARING and GRANTING IN PART 70 Motion for Facilitated Confidential Attorney/Client Phone Calls; ORDER to Facilitate Telephone Call signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/23/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Assist Plaintiff's Counsel in Response/Reply to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING Previous Briefing Schedule and Setting New Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/16/17. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 7/27/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Marrujo, C)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant R.N. Rice be Dismissed From This Action, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/14/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Court Should Not Issue Findings and Recommendations Recommending that Defendant R.N. Rice be Dismissed From this Action, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M) signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2017. Show Cause Response due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 42 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING AD MOOT 34 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/2017. Defendants Brennan, Lundey, Rice, R. Schmidt, B. Wedertz, K. Allen and Anderson terminated. (Jessen, A)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 51 Request to Reschedule the Telephonic Status Conference and Request for the Court to Instruct the Institution, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REQUEST for the Warden of R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility to Confirm That Plaintiff is Receiving Mail and Has Access to the Courts and His Counsel; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send a Copy of This Order to Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson and the Warden of R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/29/17: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Copy of Service Documents, Extension of Time, and Leave to Amend; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Order, and To Send Plaintiff's Counsel a Copy of the Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/22/17. (Copy of this order will be sent to Plaintiff at address listed on doc 41 ). (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be Denied as Moot 34 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/21/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCREENING ORDER FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That All Other Claims and Defendants Be Dismissed With Prejudice 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/17: 30-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Petitioner/Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Notification for Attorney on Record, StanleyGoff, Esq., signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/31/16. (Verduzco, M)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 23 and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and an Investigator 3 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/7/16. (Verduzco, M)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/28/15, referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying In Forma Pauperis Motion as Moot and GRANTING Motion for Service by United States Marshal 20 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/13/15. (Hellings, J)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Motion, With Prejudice, and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Return Exhibits to Plaintiff 18 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/31/15. (Hellings, J)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 16 Motion as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/27/15. (Verduzco, M)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 14 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis as Moot, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/25/15. (Verduzco, M)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Apply the Filing Fee, in the amount of $400.00 that was paid in 1:15-cv-680 DLB (PC) to be Applied to this Case as to 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/18/2015. (Copy of this order electronicly served on Fresno and Sacramento Financial) (Also a signed hard copy forwarded to Sac-Financial)(Martin-Gill, S)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying Motion To Transfer Exhibits Filed In Case Number 1:15-cv-00680-DLB(PC) To This Case (Doc. 4 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/17/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Razo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Antonio Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Razo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Wedertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?