Ricks v. Austria et al
Plaintiff: Scott K. Ricks
Defendant: A. Austria, G. Chernekoff, N. Odeluga and J. Clark Kelso
Case Number: 1:2015cv01147
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Change of Venue, as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Denying 59 Motion to Appoint Counsel, as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/4/18. (Gonzalez, R)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Second Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Demand for trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/9/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 49 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/26/2018: This case proceeds only on Plaintiff's claim against Defendant Austria for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs in violation of the Eighth Amendment. (Hellings, J)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Defendant's 41 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted, and Recommending the Parties' 42 50 Motions to Consolidate be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/14/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii; Fourteen-Day Deadline.(Flores, E)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/22/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 1/8/2018.(Flores, E)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Third 38 Motion for Explanation of Legal Terminology and Procedures, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth and Fifth Motions Requesting the Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice 32 , 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/5/16. (Hellings, J)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 25 Plaintiff's Third Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/2016. (Jessen, A)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion For Appointment Of Counsel (ECF No. 17 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/8/2016. (Fahrney, E)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 12 Motion for Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/25/15. (Verduzco, M)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/30/15. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Austria et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott K. Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Austria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Chernekoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Odeluga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?