Quiroga v. Aguilara et al
Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga
Defendant: Aguilara, Medical Staff and Medical Escort Porter
Case Number: 1:2015cv01202
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Proceed IFP as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED With Prejudice, the Dismissal Count as a Strike Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), and the Clerk of Court Terminate Any and All Pending Motions and Close the Case re 18 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/16/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/2016. The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for disposition of Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and screening of Plaintiff's complaint. (Jessen, A)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO OBEY A COURT ORDER AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE 5 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/23/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/9/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Notice of Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/21/15. 21-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quiroga v. Aguilara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monico J. Quiroga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aguilara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Escort Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?