Beason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joseph James Beason
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01281
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the Award and Payment of Equal Access to Justice Act Fees, Costs, and Expenses (ECF No. 29 ). Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($5,000.00), and costs of FOUR HUNDRED DOLLARS ($400.00), subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (ECF Nos. 26 and 28 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/30/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that: 1) The Court GRANT Beason's appeal from the administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security; 2) The Court FIND that the ALJ's decision that Beason is not disabled is not support ed by substantial evidence in the record as a whole; 3) This case be REMANDED to the agency for further proceedings consistent with these Findings and Recommendations; and 4) The Clerk of the Court be DIRECTED to enter judgement in favor of Plaintiff , JOSEPH JAMES BEASON, and against Defendant, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. These Findings and Recommendations are referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd, with objections due fifteen days after service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/14/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/24/2016. (Defendant's Opposition Brief no later than 7/1/2016, Plaintiff's Reply Brief no later than 7/18/2016.) (Valdez, E)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on March 30, 2016. (ECF No. 9)(Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beason v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph James Beason
Represented By: James A. Yoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?