San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Jewell et al
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District
Defendant: Sally Jewell, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Bureau of Reclamation, Estevan Lopez, David Murillo and Hoopa Valley Tribe
Intervenor_defendant: Yurok Tribe and Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations/Institute for Fisheries Resources
Case Number: 1:2015cv01290
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY FOURTEEN DAYS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 4, 2017. (Munoz, I)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DISMISSING FIRST THROUGH FIFTH CLAIMS AS MOOT AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS' STANDING TO PURSUE SIXTH THROUGH EIGHTH CLAIMS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 17, 2017. (Munoz, I)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/3/17. Deadline: 03/31/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPLETE THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Doc. 75) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 23, 2016. (Munoz, I)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/ PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Docs. 2 & 5) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 26, 2015. (Munoz, I)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PCFFA's 31 Motion to Intervene signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/24/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING Hoopa Valley Tribe's 24 Motion to Intervene as Defendant signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/24/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority et al v. Jewell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Dulcinea Z. Hanuschak, PHV
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Represented By: Steven O. Sims, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estevan Lopez
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Murillo
Represented By: Anna K. Stimmel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoopa Valley Tribe
Represented By: Thomas P. Schlosser, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Yurok Tribe
Represented By: Nathan Markus Voegeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations/Institute for Fisheries Resources
Represented By: Jan Hasselman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?