Ondracek v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Mark Steven Ondracek
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01308
Filed: August 26, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, 25 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/9/2017. (Timken, A)
February 22, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/22/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 1, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time. Defendant is granted an extension of time, up and including November 7, 2016, to file an opposition brief. Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief on or before November 28, 2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/1/2016. (Timken, A)
June 2, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Confidential Letter Brief. Plaintiff shall have until June 3, 2016, to serve his confidential letter brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 5) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/2/2016. (Timken, A)
August 31, 2015 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/28/15. (Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ondracek v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Steven Ondracek
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?