Reese v. Davys, et al.
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Reese
Defendant: Dave Davys, P. Llamas and J. Aguirre
Case Number: 1:2015cv01337
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of Dismissal; ORDER to Clerk of Court to Close Case 35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/2017: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party shall bear his or her own litigation costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (CASE CLOSED ) (Hellings, J)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER following Settlement; vacating dates and directing parties to file dispositive documents within 14-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that inmate Clarence E. Reese is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum 28 is discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Clarence E. Reese, CDCR# V-99830, for Settlement Conference on November 14, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/16/2017. (Flores, E)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RESETTING Settlement Conference Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/17: Settlement Conference RESET for 11/14/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hellings, J)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING Case for 90 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/17: Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Davys, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence E. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Llamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?