Smith v. Mirelez et al
Plaintiff: James Smith
Defendant: Rudy Mirelez, Devan M. Portillo, Eugene Action and Kamala D. Harris
Case Number: 1:2015cv01343
Filed: September 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Mariposa
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/21/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 4/10/2017.(Flores, E)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING the first amended complaint with leave to amend, document 8 , with the second amended complaint due by 11/14/2016. The Court further DISMISSES plaintiff's motion requesting to move forward with the case and for a subpoena, document 4 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/30/2016. (Rooney, M)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiff is instructed to consider the standards set forth in this Order and should only file an amended complaint if he believes his claims are cognizable. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than February 26, 2016. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended complaint by the date specified will result in dismissal of this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/12/2016. (Rooney, M)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/8/2015. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Mirelez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Mirelez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devan M. Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Action
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?