Muhammad v. Komin et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Muhammad
Defendant: Komin and Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2015cv01373
Filed: September 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice, based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this case and failure to comply with Court Orders; Clerk directed to close this case re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/16/18. Objections to F&R due 21-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DISCOVERY ORDERS Following Initial Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/8/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting 29 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent With Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision re 11 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/29/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER discharging 25 Order to Show Cause; setting Scheduling Conference and directing Clerk to assign District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/28/2017. Case assigned to District Judge, Dale A. Drozd. Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures due within 30-Days. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2017. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Komin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?