Rowland v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Casey Lee Rowland
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard, Dave Davy, P. Llamas, Melo, Ric Pavich, Leon and F. Vasquez
Case Number: 1:2015cv01475
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Defendants' 26 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sur-Reply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Defendant's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment for the Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/11/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 10/1/2018.(Flores, E)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/26/2018. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Directing Defendants to Consent or Decline to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/18/2017. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 18 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/17. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISREGARDING Plaintiff's Consent or Decline Form Filed on October 9, 2015 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-1937 DAD) to Fresno (1:15-cv-1475 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/28/15. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Lee Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Llamas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric Pavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?