Mora v. Cal West Ag Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmela Mora
Defendant: Cal West Ag Services, Inc., Jon Marthedal and Eric Marthedal
Case Number: 1:2015cv01490
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:1801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Adopting 100 Findings and Recommendations Recommending Granting 88 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, and Entering Final Judgment, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/8/19. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Findings and Recommendations regarding 88 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action settlement and claims administrator's fee, and for entry of final judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/13/2019. Motion referred to Judge O' Neill. Objections to F&R due by 6/3/2019. (Rosales, O.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER APPROVING Proposed Revised Notice Process signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/10/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order re schedule for final approval of settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/24/2018. (Claims Process Deadline: 11/23/2018; Final Approval papers filed by 11/30/2018; Final Approval Hearing set for 1/11/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean )(Rosales, O)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ADOPTING IN FULL FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of Settlement Class, Approval of Class Notice Package, Approval of Plaintiffs' Payments, Appointment of Counsel and Settlement Administrator, and Setting of Final Approval Hearing 71 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/22/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 26, 2018. (Munoz, I)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Findings and Recommendations regarding Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, conditional certification of settlement class, approval of class notice package, approval of plaintiffs payments, appointment of class counsel and settlement administrator, and setting of final approval hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/2014. Motion referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 7/12/2018. (Rosales, O)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER directing the parties to re-submit a fully-signed stipulation and order requesting the dismissal of defendant Cal West Ag Services, Inc. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2018. (Rooney, M)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Stipulation to continue class certification schedule; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/25/2017. ( Motion for Class Certification filed by 2/13/2018; Opposition to Motion for Class Certification due by 3/6/2018; Reply due by 3/27/2018; Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 5/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the non-expert discovery deadline to 8/21/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/25/2016. (Rooney, M)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/7/2016 and CONTINUING it to 4/19/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/4/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. Cal West Ag Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmela Mora
Represented By: Stanley S. Mallison
Represented By: Hector Rodriguez Martinez
Represented By: Marco A. Palau
Represented By: Joseph Donald Sutton
Represented By: Eric Sebastian Trabucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal West Ag Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Marthedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Marthedal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?