Hutchins, Jr. v. Lockyer, et al.
Plaintiff: Clifton Hutchins, Jr.
Defendant: Bill Lockyer, A. Klang, A. Youssef, A. Johal, Sheheta, Ramos, Patel, J. Katavich and J. Lewis
Case Number: 1:2015cv01537
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' 59 Motion, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/25/2020. Opposition Deadline due within THIRTY (30) DAYS. (Orozco, A)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER MODIFYING Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 06/07/2019. Status Conference set for 6/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson.(Flores, E)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 53 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; This case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/4/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Defendant Johal's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 41 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 4/12/2019: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 42 Motion to Stay Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/10/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 36 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/8/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Adopting 34 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant to File Answer Within Twenty-One Days, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/27/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REINSTATING DISMISSED CLAIMS re 26 and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims re 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/21/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 30 ; Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/22/17: CASE ASSIGNED to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. New Case No. 1:15-cv-01537 DAD MJS (PC); Fourteen Day Objection Deadline.(Hellings, J)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Motion for Service of Premature 8 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/30/15. (Hellings, J)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-2036 DAD PC) to Fresno (1:15-cv-1537 SKO PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/8/2015; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchins, Jr. v. Lockyer, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Hutchins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lockyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Klang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Johal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheheta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?