Hodge v. Gonzales et al
Plaintiff: Mark Hodge
Defendant: J. Gonzales and H. Flores
Case Number: 1:2015cv01618
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Motion for Court Order to be Sent Back to Ironwood State Prison, as Unnecessary 60 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/4/17. (Hellings, J)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Mark Hodge, CDCR #K-38609, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/17. (Marrujo, C)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/15/17. Deadline: 10/9/2017.(Marrujo, C)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Mark Hodge, CDCR# K-38609, for Settlement Conference on September 18, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., at Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/18/2017. (Flores, E)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 39 Request for Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents (Set One), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/6/17: Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM at California State Prison, Corcoran, 4001 King Avenue, Corcoran, CA 93212. (Hellings, J)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 27 ; ORDER Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 17 , Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint 24 , and Plaintiff's Motion for Scheduling Order 23 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/29/17: This matter is referred back to the assigned Magistrate Judge for proceedings consistent with this order. (Hellings, J)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint; and Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?