Doe v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: County of Kern and George Anderson
Case Number: 1:2015cv01641
Filed: October 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/5/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING 145 Motion to Modify Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2017. (Hall, S)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 147 Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 9/1/2017. (Hall, S)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER VACATING WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum Directing the Production of Selena Deleon signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER AFTER 141 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 8/11/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/2017. Order includes instructions for filing motions and related documents under seal. (Hall, S)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING 88 Stipulation Extending the Briefing Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/10/2017. Plaintiff's brief due by 6/14/2017; defendants' response due by 6/28/2017; plaintiff's reply due by 7/3/2017. (Hall, S)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/19/2017. (Hall, S)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 60 Motion for Summary Adjudication, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2017. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 53 Request to Seal Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2017. (Hall, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/2/2017. The new case number is 1:15-cv-01641-JLT(Lundstrom, T)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER on 51 Joint Stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/3/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/10/2017; Hearing 4/18/2017; Motion to seal by 2/27/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 6/5/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 8/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying 48 Request to Seal and Referring to Assigned Magistrate Judge for Further Scheduling, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AFTER IN CAMERA REVIEW, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2016. (Hall, S)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER 45 to Continue Discovery Cut Off Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2016. (Hall, S)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2016. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/2016. (Hall, S)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AFTER MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/2016. (Hall, S)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/21/2016. (Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/7/2016, at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Settlement Conference set for 4/19/2017, at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2017, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 6/27/2017, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/3/2016. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. County of Kern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: David K. Cohn
Represented By: Neil K Gehlawat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Kathleen Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Anderson
Represented By: Leslie M. Dillahunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?