Carroll v. City of Modesto
Plaintiff: Stephen A Carroll
Defendant: City of Modesto
Case Number: 1:2015cv01691
Filed: November 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND CLOSING CASE IN LIGHT OF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/31/17. (Robles, S)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER lifting Stay and setting Briefing Schedule as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/17/2017. (Opposition due by 3/10/2017 and Repy due by 3/17/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for parties to submit Status Report signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2017. ( Filing Deadline: 2/17/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING Litgation. This litigation is STAYED until August 15, 2016; the Scheduling Conference set for February 9, 2016, is VACATED; and within fourteen (14) days of resolution of the Stanislaus County Superior Court matter, the parties shall file a status report indicating whether the litigation may proceed. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/1/2016. (Timken, A)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING HEARING Date of January 11, 2016, and taking matter under submission, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/7/2016. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. City of Modesto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Represented By: Bradley J. Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?