Maria Teresa Cisneros-Bello v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Cisneros-Bello
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01698
Filed: November 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AWARDING Motion for Attorney's Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, Pursuant to the Terms of the Parties' Stipulation; ORDER Terminating as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Fees 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/27/2017. (Hall, S)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2017. Response to motion due by 7/28/2017. (Hall, S)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Defendant's Request for an Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/17/2016. Defendant's responsive brief shall be filed by 10/31/2016. (Hall, S)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Request for a Third Extension of Time Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/2016. (Hall, S)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 13 Plaintiff's Request for a Second Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2016. Brief due by 9/6/2016. (Hall, S)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/9/2016. Responsive brief due by 7/8/2016. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maria Teresa Cisneros-Bello v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Cisneros-Bello
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?