Rhodes v. Fresno County, et al.
Plaintiff: Percy Lee Rhodes
Defendant: Fresno County, Fresno County Sheriff's Department, Pat, Vivian, D Lang, Margaret Mims, K Nunez and Jennifer Horton
Case Number: 1:2015cv01714
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Denying as Moot Plaintiff's 95 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/02/2019. (Flores, E)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion to Reopen Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/31/2019. (Flores, E)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's 89 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal within Ten Days from the Date of Service of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/18. (10-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting Defendants' 86 Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Deposition and Granting Request for Expenses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/20/2018. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Ravijot Gill, M.D., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/29/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER EXTENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Pat Alexander 79 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/16/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiff's Second 75 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/10/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ADOPTING 71 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/7/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a United States District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-Serve the September 14, 2017, Order 59 , 63 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/4/17. (Hellings, J)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Laure Rodriguez, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(M) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Laure Rodriguez should not be Dismissed Pursuant to Rule 4(M) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures; Show Cause Response due within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's Third 48 Motion for Court Order Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve Court's March 16, 2017, Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/13/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SECOND ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve the Court's March 16, 2017 Order 37 . Along with the Necessary Service of Process Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/17. Service Documents Return Deadline: Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Injunctive Relief and Request for Judicial Notice 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause and Directing Clerk of Court to Re-Serve Court's March 16, 2017, Order Along with the Necessary Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/16/2017. (Flores, E)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute and Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/1/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING 33 Order of Dismissal Dated February 14, 2017, and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to Comply with the Court's December 8, 2016, Screening Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/18/2017. Show Cause Response due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/28/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/16. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure to Comply With a Court Order and Failure to State a Cognizable Claim For Relief 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/16: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-2220 KJN) to Fresno (1:15-cv-1714 LJO) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/10/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Fresno County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Lee Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?