Hillard et al v. Rite Aid Corporation
Plaintiff: Bart Hillard, Joshua Roach and Gary Williams
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv01748
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/2/2018 ORDERING, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/5/2018 APPROVING 46 Stipulation, EXTENDING Dispositive motion deadline to 3/15/2018, and CONTINUING Hearing on such motion to 4/24/2018, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 6 (JAM), before District Judge John A. Mendez. (York, M)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/10/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff Gary Williams's claims only shall be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to those claims.(Becknal, R)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/1/17 ORDERING that plaintiff Bart Hilliard's claims only shall be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each side to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees with respect to those claims. (Becknal, R)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/17 ORDERING that the deadlines are EXTENDED as follows: The close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 9/29/17, to 12/29/2017; The Dispositive Motion deadline is EXTENDED from 12/8/17, to 3/8/2018. The dispositive Motion hearing date is CONTINUED from 1/9/18, to 4/9/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/2017 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:17-cv-01527 MCE CKD within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. (Michel, G.)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2017 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 9/29/2017; ORDERING that dispositive motions be filed by 12/8/2017 and noticed for hearing on 1/9/2018. (Michel, G.)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/17 ORDERING that the deadlines in the following cases are extended as follows: the close of Discovery is EXTENDED from 4/28/17, to 7/28/17; the Dispositive Motion deadline is EXT ENDED from 7/11/17, to 10/10/17; and the Dispositive Motion Hearing date is CONTINUED from 8/8/17, to 11/7/17 at 1:30 p.m. This order applies only to the following related cases: 2:13-CV-02439 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01946 JAM-EFB; 2:14-CV-01960 JAM -EFB; 2:15-CV-00623 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02150 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02396 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01748 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02597 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01872 JAM-EFB; 1:15-CV-01874 JAM-EFB; 2:15-CV-02594 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00174 JAM-EFB; 2:16-CV-00211 JAM-EFB; and 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB. (Becknal, R)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/13/16. (Kaminski, H)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/2016 ORDERING that Rite Aid Corporation's objections to the Court's 6/9/2016 Status Order (Doc #47-Case #14-cv-1961) are OVERRULED. (Zignago, K.)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/18/16 ORDERING that this action is related to case 2:16-CV-01028 JAM-EFB.(Becknal, R)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/4/16 ORDERING that the Status Conference is CONTINUED to 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. The parties shall file a single joint status report no later than 5/18/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 02/05/16 ORDERING that case 2:16-cv-0174 is RELATED to the following cases: 2:14-cv-01961, 2:14-cv-01960, 2:14-cv-01957, 2:14-cv-01946, 2:14-cv-01965, No. 2:13-CV-02439, No. 2:14-cv-01963, No. 2:15-CV-00429, No. 2:15-CV-00623, No. 2:15-CV-00622, 2:15-CV-02150, No. 1:15-cv-01721, No. 2:15-cv-02396, 1:1 5-cv-01748, 2:15-cv-02597, 1:15-cv-01872, 1:15-cv-01874, 2:15-cv-02594. (Benson, A)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/3/16 Related Case(s) with 2:13cv2439 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1946 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1957 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1960 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1961 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1963 JAM EFB, 2:14cv1965 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1721 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1748 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1872 JAM EFB, 1:15cv1874 JAM EFB, 2:15cv429 JAM EFB, 2:15cv622 JAM EFB, 2:15cv623 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2150 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2396 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2594 JAM EFB, 2:15cv2597 JAM EFB, REASSIGNING CASE 2:16cv211 JAM KJN to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:16-CV-211 JAM EFB.(Reader, L)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/2016 FINDING that the case denominated 2:14-cv-01946 JAM EFB is related to the actions denominated 1:15-cv-01872 JAM JLT, 2:15-cv-02594 JAM AC and 2:15-cv-02597 JAM CMK within the mea ning of Local Rule 123; ORDERING that the magistrate judge assignment in said related cases be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned cases be shown as 1:15-cv-01872 JAM EFB, 2:15-cv-02594 JAM EFB and 2:15-cv-02597 JAM EFB, respectively. (Michel, G.)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/19/2016 FINDING that the case denominated 2:14-cv-01946 JAM EFB is related to the actions denominated 2:15-cv-02396 JAM CMK and 1:15-cv-01874 JAM SAB within the meaning of Local Rule 123 ; ORDERING that the magistrate judge assignment in said related cases be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings; ORDERING that the caption on all documents filed henceforth in the reassigned cases be shown as 2:15-cv-02396 JAM EFB and 1:15-cv-01874 JAM EFB, respectively. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillard et al v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Hillard
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Roach
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Williams
Represented By: John James Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Gina Guarienti Cook
Represented By: Rishi Nand Sharma
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?