Smith v. Youngblood, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Weston Smith
Defendant: Donny Youngblood and County of Kern
Case Number: 1:2015cv01749
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2021. Settlement Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/6/19 ORDERING that the initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on May17, 2019. Supplemental expert disclosure shall be due by June 6, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/5/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED That initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on 5/3/2019 and supplemental expert disclosure due by 5/23/2019.(Reader, L)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/13/19 ORDERING that the initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on 4/3/2019 and supplemental expert disclosure shall remain due 20 days from 3/21/2019, by 4/10/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/5/2018 ORDERING all discovery shall be completed by 1/28/2019; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/21/2019; The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 4/18/2019. (Zignago, K.)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/2/18: All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by Monday, October 29, 2018. All counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert they propose to tender at trial not later than Thursday, December 17, 2018. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be Thursday, April 14, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2018 CONTINUING dates as follows: All discovery shall be completed by 7/30/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2018; The last day to hear Dispositive Motions is 10/8/2018. (Zignago, K.)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/27/2017 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 3/26/2018; ORDERING that all counsel to designate experts by 5/17/2018; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 6/7/2018. (Hunt, G)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/28/2017 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 1/15/2018; ORDERING all counsel to designate experts by 3/15/2018; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 4/5/2018. (Michel, G.)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/18/17 ORDERING All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by Monday, 9/18/17. All counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to tender at trial not later than Thursday, 11/16/17. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be Monday, 10/2/17. (Becknal, R)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/22/2017. (Hall, S)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Changing Location of the Settlement Conference; ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/14/2016. Settlement conference set for 1/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield. (Hall, S)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff shall be GRANTED a 14 day extension of time, up to and including 9/15/2016, to file any First Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/12/2016 ORDERING 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; as conceded by Plaintiff, the Fourth Cause of Action, to the extent it includ es the County of Kern, fails to state a viable claim and the County is consequently DISMISSED from that cause of action; Moreover, all allegations against Defendant Youngblood are DENIED as insufficient on grounds that it cannot be determined from the Complaint whether Youngblood is being sued in his official or personal capacity; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is, however, DENIED as to the Third Cause of Action which suffices for pleadings purposes; Defendants' request to strike al l allegations in the First, Second and Third Causes of Action which purport to be based on the Eighth Amendment is GRANTED; all allegations pertaining to negligent or careless conduct, to the extent those allegations pertain to the First, Second or Third Causes of Action, are also STRICKEN; finally, the Second Cause of Action is STRICKEN in any event as redundant to the allegations already made in the First Cause of Action; Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint within 20 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, should he wish to do so. (Reader, L)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2016 ORDERING 12 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is CONTINUED to 2/11/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.(Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Youngblood, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Weston Smith
Represented By: Ralph B Wegis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Marshall Scott Fontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Kern
Represented By: Marshall Scott Fontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?