Colston v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Charles Colston
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01750
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER For Award of Attorney's Fees. Fees in the amount of seven thousand five hundred dollars ($7,500) under EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), shall be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/29/2017. (Timken, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/28/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR A FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE HER RESPONSIVE BRIEF. Defendant shall have an extension of time, to and including January 20, 2017, by which to file her responsive brief. Any reply by Plaintiff shall be due by February 6, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/2/2016. (Thorp, J)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The deadline by which Plaintiff shall file his summary judgment brief is extended to October 19, 2016. Defendant's responsive brief shall be filed on or before November 21, 2016, and Plaintiff may file an optional reply brief on or before December 9, 2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/29/2016. (Timken, A)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colston v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Charles Colston
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?