Jones et al v. Tulare County et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Jones and William Fabricius
Defendant: Tulare County, Tulare County Animal Control, Tulare County Sheriff's Office, Paul Grenseman, Oren Hartley, Jeffrey Lewis, Larry Hernandez, Carothers, Lutz, Dirkson, Torres, Yandell, Young and Wallace
Case Number: 1:2015cv01779
Filed: November 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/9/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DENYING plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to the order to show cause, document 113 . Plaintiff must file a response to the order to show cause, document 110 , by no later than 11/1/2018 as previously ordered or face dismissal. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/18/2018. (Rooney, M)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed as Barred by Statute of Limitations and GRANTING IN PART Request for Copies 111 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/7/2018: Show Cause Response due by 11/1/2018.(Hellings, J)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed as barred by statue of limitations, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2018. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2018. (Rosales, O)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS That Defendants' Motions to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART 78 , 88 , 106 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/10/2018: This action is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss be granted in part and denied in part, documents 78 88 , as follows: 1) All claims against Valeriano Saucedo, Thomas Elliott Hornburg, Ralph Mario Agnello, Cecile F . Shaffer, Kathleen Marie Bales-Lange, Lisa Marie Tennenbaum, and Zendajas, who have not been served in this action, should be dismissed with prejudice; and 2) Defendants' motions to dismiss, (ECF Nos. 78 88 ), should be granted as to all rema ining claims and defendants, except Tulare County Sheriff Officers Bradley McLean and Lance Heiden for unreasonable force in violation of the Fourth Amendment. These findings are referred to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, with objections to same due with twenty days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/15/2018. (Rooney, M)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Findings and Recommendations recommending that certain Defendants be dismissed from this Action, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/1/2018. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 2/18/2018. (Rosales, O)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Directing Service by the United States Marshal Service Without Prepayment of Costs signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/26/2017. (Jessen, A)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order to Show Cause why the action should not be dismissed against new Defendants listed in the Third Amended Complaint for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the court's order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/15/2017. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2017. (Rosales, O)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order dismissing Second Amended Complaint with leave to amend; Thirty day deadline to file an amended complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/19/2017. Third Amended Complaint due by 7/24/2017. (Rosales, O)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER suspending responsive pleading deadline, document 71 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 65 & 68 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING motion for an extension of time, document 64 . A final deadline of May 1, 2017, will be set for plaintiff William Fabricius to file a Second Amended Complaint. The deadline will remain in place regardless of his status concerning lega l representation. No further requests for additional time will be granted. If Second Amended Complaint is not filed by May 1, 2017, the remainder of this case will be dismissed. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/28/2017. (Rooney, M)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 34 ) and DENYING Defendants' motion for sanctions (ECF No. 37 ). All claims in the First Amended Complaint pertaining to Plaintiff Wendy Jones are DISMISSED without prejudice and witho ut leave to amend. All claims in the First Amended Complaint pertaining to Plaintiff William Fabricius are DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Fabricius is grant ed leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within THIRTY days of this order. Failure to file an amended complaint within thirty days will result in dismissal of this action. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/1/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING Defendant Paul Grenseman's request to file his responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint no later than September 2, 2016. The Court notes that Plaintiffs and all Defendants, except for Defendant Grenseman , have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1). (ECF Nos. 26 and 29 ) Defendant Grenseman is thus DIRECTED to either consent or decline to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction no later than Se ptember 2, 2016. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 34 ) and Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 37 ), currently set for September 2, 2016, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be re-set after the Court has received Defendant Grenseman's resp onsive pleading(s) and consent/decline form. The briefing schedule for these motions remains unchanged; filing deadlines for the opposition and reply briefs remain as dictated by the noticed hearing date (i.e., September 2, 2016) and Local Rule 230(c) and (d). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/2016. (Rooney, M)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 8/2/2016 for receipt of plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss, document 34 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/2017. (Rooney, M)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 2 , 3 , 6 and 7 Motion to Proceed IFP; Clerk to issue Summons and Civil New Case Documents along with Setting a Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/8/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Complete Their Applications to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re 2 , 3 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/30/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Tulare County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Jones
Represented By: Christine Louise Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fabricius
Represented By: Christine Louise Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Animal Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Grenseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oren Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?