Del Real v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Albert Del Real
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv01911
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CONTINUING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: All remaining dates in the scheduling order are VACATED; Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendants motion to dismiss on or before August 16, 2017; Defendants reply, if any, shall be filed on or before August 30, 2017; The hearing on Defendants motion to dismiss shall be continued to September 6, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; and a further trial setting conference shall be held after the order issues addressing Defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER for Independent Medical Examination signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/17/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Stipulation to Substitute the United States of America into the Case in Place of the United States Postal Service and to Dismiss Doe Defendants from Plaintiff's Complaint; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/30/15. United States Postal Service terminated.(Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Real v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Del Real
Represented By: Michael Alan Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Trinka Ernce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?