Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Edward Garcia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01951
Filed: December 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT in Favor of Defendant, Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, and Against Plaintiff Edward Garcia, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/9/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Defendant's Request for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2016. Responsive brief due by 11/4/2016. (Hall, S)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/28/2016. Plaintiff's confidential letter brief due by 7/27/2016. (Hall, S)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER Directing Service of the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Garcia
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?