Galicia v. Marsh et al
Plaintiff: Jose Galicia
Defendant: T. Marsh, T. Perez, A. Guzman, M. Jennings, K. Weatherford and B. Weaver
Case Number: 1:2016cv00011
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 90 Motion to File a Surreply be Granted, and Defendant's 77 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/17/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Thirty Days. (Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 88 Motion to File a Surreply as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's Objections to the Court's January 16, 2018 Order Denying his Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Directing Defendant to File a Response to 75 Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel, Filed on January 19, 2018, Within Twenty (20) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/23/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 71 Motion to Compel Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Adopting 66 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/7/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal of certain claims and defendants re 9 , 12 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2017. Amended Pleading Deadline: 10/23/2017. Discovery due by 12/26/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/26/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER adopting 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER adopting FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 59 ; granting Defendants Marsh and Weatherford's MOTION to DISMISS 28 , 31 ; dismissing due process claims against Defendants Marsh and Weatherford, without prejudice and denying MOTION for LEAVE to AMEND as moot 32 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' 40 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST THE ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 7/13/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DEEMING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed November 21, 2016, Submitted for Review signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Marsh and Weatherford's Motion to Dismiss be granted; Due process claims against Defendants Marsh and Weatherford be Dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's Moiton to Amend the compl aint be denied as moot re 32 MOTION to AMEND the 9 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, 31 MOTION to DISMISS and 28 MOTION to DISMISS ;referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/05/2017. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 MOTION TO VACATE THE DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/21/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/28/2017 granting Plaintiff's Motion to Stay ruling on Defendants' motion for summary judgment and denying Plaintiff's Request for Court Order to correspond with inmate witnesses 50 . (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galicia v. Marsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Galicia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?