Miskell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Miskell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00105
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR AWARD and PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES. Fees in the amount of four thousand seven hundred thirty-four dollars and thirty-nine cents ($4,734.39) and expenses in the amount of eight dollars and ninety-fou r cents ($8.94), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §2412, for a total of four thousand seven hundred and forty-three dollars and thirty-three cents ($4,743.33) shall be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/31/2017. (Timken, A)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/1/17: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion, (Doc. 17), DENIES Defendant's Motion, (Doc. 18), REVERSES the final decision of the Commissioner, and REMANDS this matter for further proceedings. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall have a first extension of time of fourteen (14) days, up to and including November 18, 2016, to file his Opening Brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 5) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2016. (Timken, A)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time, up to and including August 31, 2016, to file his Confidential Letter Brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 5) are modified accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/4/2016. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miskell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lee Miskell
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?