Gray v. Elliott Family Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Arthur Gray
Defendant: Elliott Family Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00156
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/6/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AFTER 29 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2016. Stipulated dismissal due by 2/3/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL CONFERENCE on Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/2/2016. (Hall, S)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 9/19/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 2/20/2017; Expert 3/13/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bak ersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/20/2017; Hearing by 4/17/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/3/2017; Hearing by 5/31/2017. Bench Trial set for 7/11/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2016. Settlement Conference set for 6/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG), Fresno, before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Hall, S)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2016. Joint stipulation/status report re: settlement conference due by 5/13/2016. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Elliott Family Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Gray
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Mark D. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Family Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?