McCulloch v. Baker Hughes Inteq Drilling Fluids, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Marc McCulloch
Defendant: Baker Hughes Inteq Drilling Fluids, Inc. and Baker Hughes, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00157
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement and Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re 54 , 56 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/22/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 49 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/23/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER AFTER 47 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. Motion for preliminary approval of class settlement due by 4/7/2017. (Hall, S)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2016. (Hall, S)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Regarding Conditional Certification and Partial Stay (Doc. 23 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/4/2016. (The 17 Scheduling order previously entered in this action is VACATED. The parties are hereby directed to notify the cou rt within three days of the completion of mediation or by 1/20/2017, whichever is earlier, of the status of this action. The matter will thereafter be referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further scheduling as necessary and appropriate, pursuant to Local Rule 302(c).)(Gaumnitz, R)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline: 9/9/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 5/2/2016; Non-Expert 3/17/2017; Expert 5/26/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set fo r 9/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Class Certification Motion Filing Deadline: 10/7/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/9/2017; Hearing by 7/7/2017. Dispos itive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/4/2017; Hearing by 9/5/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 12/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCulloch v. Baker Hughes Inteq Drilling Fluids, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc McCulloch
Represented By: Daniel Solomon Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Inteq Drilling Fluids, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?