Eli Lilly and Company v. Gitmed et al
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Defendant: John Derek Gitmed, Holly Gitmed, Felicia Gitmed and Anthony Pollino, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00178
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference to December 11, 2017 at 9:30 A.M., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/17. (Hellings, J)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendant John Derek Gitmed From This Action 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; Setting an Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone; and Requiring Defendant Gitmed to File an Answer to the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/2017. (Kusamura, W)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING 54 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 44 Motion for Default Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/3/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANTHONY POLLINO JR. The matter is referred to District Judge Drozd. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/23/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER VACATING MARCH 15, 2017 HEARING AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION. The Court, having reviewed the record, finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument. See Local Rule 230(g). Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission. The previously scheduled hearing set on March 15, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is HEREBY VACATED and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/13/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Supplement Application for Entry of Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/17. Five-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order and Amended Scheduling Order (ECR No. 40): It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff Eli Lilly & Company's motion to amend the scheduling order is GRANTED and the May 4, 2016 scheduling order deadlines are amended as follows: Non-expert discovery due by 4/19/2017. Non-dispositive motions due by 4/19/2017. Expert Disclosures due by 6/7/2017. Supplemental Expert Disclosures due by 6/28/2017. Expert Discovery due by 8/14/2017. Dispositive Mo tions due by 9/19/2017. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 11/20/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. JURY TRIAL set for 6/16/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The May 4, 2016 scheduling order shall remain in effect in all other aspects, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2016. (Valdez, E)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Requiring Confirmation of Address; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Serve this Order on Defendant, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/16. 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Felicia Gitmed from this Action, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/16. (Verduzco, M)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT JOHN GITMEDS MOTION FOR 120 DAY EXTENSION OF TIMEORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JOHN GITMED THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF SERVICE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE HIS RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendant John Gitmeds motion for a one hundred twe nty (120) day extension of time to file his responsive pleading is DENIED; and Defendant John Gitmed is granted thirty days (30) from the date of service of this order to file his responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/30/2016. (Hernandez, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/08/2016. (Flores, E)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Terminate Defendant Holly Gitmed from this Action, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/12/16. Holly Gitmed (an individual) Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/3/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly and Company v. Gitmed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: William Ross Overend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Derek Gitmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Gitmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Gitmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pollino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?