Fox v. Carter
Plaintiff: Keith Anderson Fox
Defendant: Ashton B. Carter
Case Number: 1:2016cv00223
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED With Prejudice for Failure to Comply With Rule 8(a) and Failure to State a Claim re 13 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/3/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendation to Dismiss Action for Failure to State a Claim 10 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/15/17. (30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Action be DISMISSED Becaue Plaintiff Has Failed to Plead in Compliance with Rule 8 and Has Failed to State a Cognizable Claim re 7 Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/5/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (ECF NO. 7 ); THIRTY (30) DAY DEADLINE, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/13/2017. (Lafata, M)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING 4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/20/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Complaint be Dismissed re 1 Complaint filed by Keith Anderson Fox. Matter is referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 08/25/2016. (Yu, L)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/29/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Anderson Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton B. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?