Clamp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael J. Clamp
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00248
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Directing Entry of Judgment in Favor of Defendant Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, and Against Plaintiff Michael John Clamp, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/6/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/15/2017: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for a failure to comply with this Court's order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written response t o this Order to Show Cause WITHIN ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff should include any request for additional time to file the brief if needed in the response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause within the time specified may result in monetary or other sanctions. (Valdez, E)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE NUNC PRO TUNC signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2016: Pursuant to the above stipulation of the parties (Doc. 17), Plaintiff shall file her opening brief no later than February 2, 2017. Defendant shall file its opposition no later than March 6, 2017. Any reply by plaintiff will be due March 21, 2017. (Valdez, E)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff shall file his opening brief no later than December 15, 2016; Defendant shall file its opposition no later than January 16, 2017; and any optional reply shall be filed no later than January 31, 2017. All other orders contained in the scheduling order issued on February 23, 2016 (Doc. 5), remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/4/2016. (Valdez, E)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time, to and including August 30, 2016, for Plaintiff to provide Defendant with Plaintiff's Settlement Letter Brief; Defendant may have an extension of time to October 4, 2016, to provide a response, with all other dates as set forth in the Case Management Order adjusted accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 9/6/2016. (Rooney, M)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/23/16. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clamp v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Clamp
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?