Soojian v. Lizarraga
Petitioner: Tannen Soojian
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga
Case Number: 1:2016cv00254
Filed: February 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER appointing Counsel signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/21/2020. Attorney Tony Faryar Farmani added for Tannen Soojian. (Lundstrom, T)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 65 Request for Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/7/19. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 64 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Expansion and Development of the Record signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/9/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Denied re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tannen Soojian ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/24/2018. Objections to F&R due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/20/17: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Adopting 40 Findings and Recommendations, Denying 36 Motion to Stay, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Petitioner's 36 Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 4/24/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISCHARGING 26 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/17/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/16/16. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/25/2016. (Flores, E)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-0371 AC HC) to Fresno (1:16-cv-0254 SAB HC) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/23/2016; this court has not ruled on petitioner's request to proceed ifp, or request for appointment of counsel.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soojian v. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tannen Soojian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga
Represented By: Amanda Diane Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?