Martin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00338
Filed: March 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: Notice of Settlement, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/22/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re SCHEDULE - Pretrial Motion Hearing set for (VTC) 6/20/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Pretrial Conference set for (VTC) 8/8/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, Final Pretrial Conference set for (VTC) 8/29/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sam E. Haddon, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/9/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re Telephonic Status Conference, signed by District Judge Sam E. Haddon on 3/7/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to Partially Revise the Court's Scheduling Order - Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off April 6, 2017, Expert Disclosure May 8, 2017, Supplemental/Rebuttal Expert Disclosure May 15, 2017, Expert Discovery Cut-Off June 16, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/21/2017. (Kusamura, W)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER to Partially Revise Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/11/2017. (Lafata, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martin
Represented By: Jason Adel Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Paul Ellingson
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Represented By: Jamie A Radack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?