Cervantes v. Lindsey
Plaintiff: Salvador Cervantes
Defendant: B. Lindsey (Badge #331295)
Case Number: 1:2016cv00343
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING 17 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/17/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/27/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF THE COURT TO ADMINISTRATIVELY REDESIGNATE CASE AS A PRISONER ACTION; VACATING ASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE; VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND VACATING JUNE 24, 2016 HEARING DATE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/2016. The new case number is 1:16-cv-00343-BAM-(PC).(Lundstrom, T)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference (stipulation Doc. 7): Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 6/9/2016 to July 21, 2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/23/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervantes v. Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Cervantes
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Consolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Lindsey (Badge #331295)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?