Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christine L Clark
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00437
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Discharding 17 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/2017. Counsel SHALL SERVE this order on the firms managing partner. (Rosales, O)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling order in this action is amended as follows: Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 3, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before May 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Within five (5) days from the entry of this order, Steven Rosales shall file a detailed plan addressing how the sch eduling orders will be complied with in the cases pending before the undersigned; Plaintiffs counsel shall serve this order on Plaintiff and the firms managing partner(s) within five (5) days of the date of service of this order; and Within five (5) days of serving this order on Plaintiff, counsel shall file proofs of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (ECF No. 15 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2017: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff shall file her opening brief on or before March 23, 2017. Defendant shall file her response to Plaintiff's opening brief on or before April 24, 2017. Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before May 9, 2017. (Valdez, E)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order re stipulation to extend briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2017. (Rosales, O)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE Stipulation for Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/25/2016. ( Letter Brief Deadline: 10/24/2016, Responses due by 11/28/2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/31/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine L Clark
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?