Rebolledo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gustavo Oceguera Rebolledo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00441
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Appeal from the Administrative Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/20/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation (Doc. 17) and ORDER for an Extension of Time for Defendant to File Her Responsive Brief: Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation for an Extension of Time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that Defendant shall have a 55-day extension, or until May 4, 2017, to submit her response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief. All other dates in the Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. This is the first extension of time requested by Defendant. However, given the lengthy extension, Defendant is warned that any further request for an extension will be denied absent a showing of good cause. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/17/2017. (Herman, H)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule; ORDER: that plaintiff may have an extension of time, to and including February 16, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief; Defendant may have an extension of time to March 20, 2017 to file his opposition, if any is forthcoming. Any reply by plaintiff will be due April 4, 2017. No further extensions of time shall be granted absent a demonstrated showing of good cause. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2017. (Herman, H)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule; ORDER that Plaintiff may have an extension of time for Plaintiff to provide Defendant with Plaintiff's Settlement Letter Brief to and including October 24, 2016; Defendant may have an extension of time to November 28, 2016 to file her response. Plaintiff's opening brief, if any, shall be due on or before January 6, 2017. All other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/27/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rebolledo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Oceguera Rebolledo
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sundeep R. Patel, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?