J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Mendoza Cervantes
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Javier Mendoza Cervantes
Case Number: 1:2016cv00485
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 61 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER VACATING the Hearing Date of August 6, 2018; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Strike the Answer and to Enter Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/20/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to DEFENDANT to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for His Failure to Comply with Court Orders, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/16/2018. Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2018. (Hall, S)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/2018. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 3/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/7/2018. (Hall, S)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Request for Telephonic Appearance at the Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/5/2018. (Hall, S)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/10/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/29/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 4/14/2017; Non-Expert/Expert 2/1/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/7/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/9/2018; Hearing by 3/9/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/9/2018; Hearing by 3/20/2018. Settleme nt Conference set for 1/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Bench Trial set for 7/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Set Aside Default; ORDER WITHDRAWING 17 Findings and Recommendations to Grant Default Judgment; ORDER GRANTING 18 the Defendant's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2017. Defendant's responsive pleading due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/28/2016. Referred to District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 6 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Complete Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/29/2016. (Hall, S)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Continuing Initial Scheduling Conference re 4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/27/2016. Initial Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 9/2/2016 at 09:15 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Mendoza Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Mendoza Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?