Redwood Fire & Casualty Insur. Co. v. Wiles, et al.
Plaintiff: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Rick A. Wiles, D&H Transportation, Inc., Silvia Luna, Rudy Gomez, Edith Martinez, Rogelio Diaz, Guadalupe Hoglen, Isela Flores and Paloma Anguino
Case Number: 1:2016cv00492
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Dismissing Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation and Settlement and Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/8/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING Status Conference, 32 . The Status Conference currently set for 9/21/2017, is CONTINUED to 11/9/2017, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint status report by no later than 11/2/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/23/2017. (Timken, A)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference currently set for 9/7/2017, is CONTINUED to 9/21/2017, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint status report no later than 8/31/2017, pursuant to the Court's Minute Order entered 5/9/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/6/2017. (Timken, A)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Stipulation to Stay, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/2/2017. (1. The proceedings in this case shall be stayed; 2. All previously set hearings, dates, and deadlines are vacated, including those set forth in the 7/22/2016 26 scheduling order; 3. The matter is referred to the magistrate judge to schedule a status conference after 8/24/2017, consistent with this order. (Thorp, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redwood Fire & Casualty Insur. Co. v. Wiles, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redwood Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick A. Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&H Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogelio Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe Hoglen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isela Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paloma Anguino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?