GSF Nut Company, LLC v. Hong Kong Bin Guo International Trading, Limited, et al
Plaintiff: GSF Nut Company, LLC
Defendant: Hong Kong Bin Guo International Trading, Limited and Hebei Yang Yuan Zhi Hui Yin Pin Gu Fen You Xian Gong Si
Case Number: 1:2016cv00501
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE Joint Notice of Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/12/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING THERETO; signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/17/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING AN EXTENSION OF TIMETO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND A RESPONSIVE PLEADING THERETO, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/10/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HEBEI AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; (30) thirty-day extension, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/3/2017. (Lafata, M)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FIFTH EX-PARTE REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER; Initial Scheduling Conference CURRENTLY set for 8/3/2017 is CONTINUED to 11/2/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/27/2017. (Lafata, M)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FOURTH EX-PARTE REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER; the Initial Scheduling Conference CURRENTLY set for 4/27/2017 is CONTINUED to 8/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Yosemite (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Parties may appear in person or by phone. Telephonic conferences are joined by calling: (888)204-5984 and entering code 4446176. Please email the Courtroom deputy to indicate if you will be appearing by telephone @ mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov. A J oint Scheduling Report shall be electronically filed in CM/ECF one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference and be e-mailed, in Word format, to mjsorders@caed.uscourts.gov, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/18/2017. (Lafata, M)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to CONTINUE Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/9/2017 is CONTINUED to 4/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/24/2017. (Lafata, M)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Second ex-parte request to Continue scheduling Conference and scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/09/2016. (Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/8/2016 has been CONTINUED to 2/9/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.) (Dean, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GSF Nut Company, LLC v. Hong Kong Bin Guo International Trading, Limited, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GSF Nut Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Dias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Bin Guo International Trading, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hebei Yang Yuan Zhi Hui Yin Pin Gu Fen You Xian Gong Si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?