Elia v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Elia
Defendant: John Roberts, Texas Environmental Products, Inc. and Texas Environmental Products
Case Number: 1:2016cv00557
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL (Doc. No. 145 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/23/2019. Plaintiff's motion for certification of an interlocutory appeal is GRANTED. (Gonzales, V)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 137 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 09/30/2019. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. (Gonzales, V)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re POST TRIAL MOTIONS. Defendants' request to amend judgment (Doc. 117) is GRANTED. The monetary award is reduced from $452,937.64 to $75,489.61. Plaintiff may request a new trial on the issue of damages from breach of contract . Plaintiff must make a formal filing to that effect by 4:00 PM on October 26, 2018. Plaintiffs' request for prejudgment interest (Doc. 108) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded interest starting from March 1, 2015. Plaintiffs' request for treble damages (Doc. 118) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys fees (Doc. 118) is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for costs (Doc. 115) is GRANTED. Plaintiff is awarded $9,099.54 in costs. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/2018. (Timken, A)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION and ORDER TO STAY ENFORCEMENT AND EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT UNTIL RESOLUTION OF POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/15/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re: Motions in Limine, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/25/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Initial Expert Disclosures due June 30, 2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due July 14, 2017; Expert Discovery due August 11, 2017; and all other dea dlines set forth in the Order and the Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Conference Order re Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff and Order Thereon (Document 18 ), shall remain in full force and effect. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Initial Expert Disclosure deadline continued to 6/9/2017; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline continued to 6/23/2017; and the Expert Discovery deadline is extended to 7/21/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/25/2017. (Rooney, M)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the initial designation of expert witnesses' deadline to 4/28/2017, with the rebuttal designation due by 5/12/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/12/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation to amend scheduling conference order re non-expert discovery cutoff; Order thereon, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/27/2016. (Non expert Discovery due by 5/26/2017) (Rosales, O)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/31/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elia v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Elia
Represented By: Neal E Costanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberts
Represented By: Kristi Danielle Kleinberg
Represented By: Marshall Craig Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Environmental Products, Inc.
Represented By: Kristi Danielle Kleinberg
Represented By: Marshall Craig Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Environmental Products
Represented By: Kristi Danielle Kleinberg
Represented By: Marshall Craig Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?