Sanchez v. Rackley
Petitioner: Felipe Guerra Sanchez
Respondent: Ronald Rackley
Case Number: 1:2016cv00604
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 43 Motion to Proceed IFP ON APPEAL signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/9/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) be DENIED signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/14/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Denying without Prejudice Respondent's 14 Motion to Dismiss, Denying Petitioner's 21 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, and Referring Matter back to Magistrate Judge signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/21/2017. (Flores, E)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny without Prejudice Respondent's 14 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 3/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Serve Order 18 and Send Petitioner Respondent's Supplemental Brief (Doc. 19 ); ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Supplemental Brief re Equitable Tolling; and ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Updated Address signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. Supplemental Brief and Updated Address due within thirty (30) days. Clerk to serve Docs. 18 , 19 and this order on plaintiff at 3 addresses. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing on Equitable Tolling and VACATING September 27, 2016 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/21/2016. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 14 be GRANTED; the petition for writ of habeas corpus be DISMISSED as untimely ; referred to Judge O'Neill, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/2016. Objections to F&R due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/3/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Felipe Guerra Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?