Palacios v. Beard et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Palacios
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard, Martin Biter, Ybarra and Elizabeth Stark
Case Number: 1:2016cv00634
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Discharging Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Francisco Palacios, CDCR# G-04439, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/09/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Francisco Palacios, CDCR# G-04439, for Settlement Conference on June 9, 2017 at 8:30 a.m., to Corcoran State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 05/16/2017. (Flores, E)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING 15 Request to Stay Responsive Pleading Deadline and Directing Defendants to File Responsive Pleading Within Ten (10) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/23/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palacios v. Beard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?