Gomez v. Sanders
Petitioner: Robert Flores Gomez
Respondent: Linda M Sanders
Case Number: 1:2016cv00662
Filed: May 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 28 AND TO DISMISS 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AS MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/1/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 9/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to File Certificate of Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE STATUS REPORT AND RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/14/2017. (Filing Deadline: 6/28/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER discharging 22 Order to Show Cause and granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/21/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Written Submission Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/17/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 9 Report and Recommendation (Sealed). The Clerk of Court is ordered to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed on May 11, 2016 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Moore, Terri) Copy mailed to Robert Gomez, 63396-097, USMCFP, P.O. Box 4000, Springfield, MO 65801-4000 on 5/11/2016 (Moore, Terri). [Transferred from mowd on 5/11/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Flores Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda M Sanders
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Christina L. Scofield(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?